Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de Colmieu

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Apr 1236SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
9 Aug 1236Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rouen, France
12 Aug 1236ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
28 May 1244AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
28 May 1244Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 1253DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Colmieu:
Cardinal Pierre de Colmieu (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
  • a cardinal for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 May 1244
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,576

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 8 Jan 2014