Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Coetquis

Deceased

Bishop of Tréguier


Events

DateEventTitle
1450¹Ordained BishopBishop
27 Jul 1453SelectedBishop of Tréguier, France
3 Oct 1453ConfirmedBishop of Tréguier, France
23 Jul 1464DiedBishop of Tréguier, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Coetquis:
Bishop Jean de Coetquis (died ) Bishop of Tréguier

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 254
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,588

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 5 Jan 2016