Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Campani

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Oct 1462AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
23 May 1463AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
7 Jul 1477DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Campani
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Campani (died ) Bishop of Teramo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 90, and Page 138
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1462, Number 25*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast