Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Ciogni

Deceased

Bishop of Venafro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1625BornRoma
20 Mar 166640.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 166943.8AppointedBishop of Venafro, Italy
6 Aug 169064.8DiedBishop of Venafro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Ciogni:
Bishop Ludovico Ciogni (born , died ) Bishop of Venafro

  • a priest for 24.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 407

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013