Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Andrzej Cikoto, M.I.C. †

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch of Harbin [Harbin] (Russian), China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1891Born
1914²22.0Ordained PriestPriest
1920²28.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
20 Oct 193947.8AppointedApostolic Exarch of Harbin [Harbin] (Russian), China
13 Feb 195361.1DiedApostolic Exarch of Harbin [Harbin] (Russian), China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Cikoto
Father Andrzej Cikoto M.I.C. (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch of Harbin [Harbin]

EventPlace
Death PlacePrison, Taischet, Russian Federation

  • a priest for 39.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast