Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sigismondo Cardinal Chigi

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1649BornRome, Italy
12 Dec 166718.9Elevated to Cardinal
166819.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
19 May 167021.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
30 Apr 167829.3DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

MicroData Summary for Sigismondo Chigi:
Cardinal Sigismondo Chigi (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

  • a cardinal for 10.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1667

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013