Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcantonio Chenevix

Deceased

Bishop of Minervino Murge, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1648Born
29 Jun 167324.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Jul 167324.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 170254.0AppointedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
26 Nov 170254.0Ordained BishopBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
Jul 1718³69.6DiedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Chenevix
Bishop Marcantonio Chenevix (born , died Jul 1718) Bishop of Minervino Murge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTurin

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 269
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast