Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine Cheevers, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Meath


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1686¹BornKillyan County Galway
2 Jul 175165.5SelectedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
17 Jul 175165.5ConfirmedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
21 Jul 175670.5SelectedBishop of Meath, Ireland
7 Aug 175670.5ConfirmedBishop of Meath, Ireland
18 Aug 177892.6DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustine Cheevers:
Bishop Augustine Cheevers O.S.A. (born 1686, died ) Bishop of Meath

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 96, and Page 283
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015