Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean du Chastel

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1423¹Born
28 Jan 145229.0AppointedArchbishop of Vienne, France
21 Nov 145330.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nîmes, France
7 Jul 145633.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Carcassonne, France
15 Sep 147552.7DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean du Chastel
Archbishop Jean du Chastel (born 1423, died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 267, and Page 201
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 118
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1452, Number 6*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Aug 2018

Quantcast