Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Chedworth (Chadworth)

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
5 May 1452AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
18 Jun 1452Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
23 Nov 1471DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Chedworth (Chadworth)
Bishop John Chedworth (Chadworth) (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

  • a bishop for 19.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,461
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 177
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 90
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1452, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Aug 2018

Quantcast