Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Adriano Cardinal Ceva

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580Born
13 Jul 164363.5Elevated to Cardinal
31 Aug 164363.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
12 Oct 165575.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

MicroData Summary for Francesco Adriano Ceva
Francesco Adriano Cardinal Ceva (born 1580, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondovi, Italy

  • a cardinal for 12.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast