Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pomponio Cardinal Cecci (Cesi)

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Aug 1538AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
24 Nov 1539AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
2 Jun 1542Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 1542InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
4 Aug 1542DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pomponio Cecci (Cesi)
Pomponio Cardinal Cecci (Cesi) (died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Nativity of Our Lord Chapel, St. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for .1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Jun 1542
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 211, and Page 306
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast