Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Centelles, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1243AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
15 Nov 1243Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
28 Mar 1252DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Centelles:
Bishop Pedro Centelles O.P. (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 128
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 295, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 24 Feb 2014