Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gavino Manca de Cedrelles

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹Born
21 Oct 158523.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 160543.4AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
26 Mar 161250.2AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
29 Jul 161351.5AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
Jul 1620³58.5DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gavino Manca de Cedrelles
Archbishop Gavino Manca de Cedrelles (born 1562, died Jul 1620) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari

  • a priest for 34.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 350, and Page 78
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 118
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast