Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Silvius de Cavalieri

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Athenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1642³BornVeroli
1 Nov 169755.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Nov 169755.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 171270.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
9 Oct 171270.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
11 Jan 171774.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Athenae

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvius de Cavalieri:
Archbishop Silvius de Cavalieri (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Athenae

  • a priest for 19.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 103
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015