Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Castilho

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Leiria, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1578AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
3 Jun 1583AppointedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
1605²ResignedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
31 Mar 1613DiedBishop Emeritus of Leiria, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Castilho (VIAF: 98564104)
Bishop Pedro de Castilho (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Leiria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoimbra

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1578, Number 23*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 110, and Page 224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast