Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zanone Castiglione

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Apr 1424AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
29 Jan 1432AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
11 Sep 1459DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

MicroData Summary for Zanone Castiglione:
Bishop Zanone Castiglione (died ) Bishop of Bayeux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 101
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014