Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Dominicus Castells

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Valencia

Titular Bishop of Geras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1732BornValencia
24 Jul 178653.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
24 Jul 178653.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
23 Jul 178855.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Dominicus Castells:
Father Dominicus Castells (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Valencia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 224, and Page 452
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016