Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Jean-Baptiste-Dominique de Castellane

Deceased

Bishop of Glandèves


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1700BornPoitiers
17 Dec 174747.0SelectedBishop of Glandèves, France
4 Mar 174847.2ConfirmedBishop of Glandèves, France
19 May 174847.4Ordained BishopBishop of Glandèves, France
8 Sep 175150.7DiedBishop of Glandèves, France

MicroData Summary for André-Jean-Baptiste-Dominique de Castellane:
Bishop André-Jean-Baptiste-Dominique de Castellane (born , died ) Bishop of Glandèves

  • a bishop for 3.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015