Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Antoine de Castellane Saint-Mauris

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lavaur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1732BornSaint-Paul-Trois-Chateaux
4 Nov 177038.6SelectedBishop of Lavaur, France
17 Jun 177139.2ConfirmedBishop of Lavaur, France
7 Jul 177139.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lavaur, France
7 Nov 180169.6ResignedBishop of Lavaur, France
22 May 180270.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Lavaur, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Jean-Antoine de Castellane Saint-Mauris:
Bishop Jean-Antoine de Castellane Saint-Mauris (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lavaur

  • a bishop for 30.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 433
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015