Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Francesco Casanova

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1695BornPigna
12 Mar 171823.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 174146.5SelectedBishop of Alghero, Italy
27 Nov 174146.7ConfirmedBishop of Alghero, Italy
3 Mar 175156.0SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
17 May 175156.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
26 Feb 176368.0DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Francesco Casanova:
Archbishop Carlo Francesco Casanova (born , died ) Archbishop of Sassari

  • a priest for 44.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 76, and Page 422
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015