Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal de Cervantes

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Administrator of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1380¹Born
24 May 142646.3Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 142646.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
Nov 143050.8AppointedAdministrator of Tuy, Spain
1437¹57.0AppointedAdministrator of Ávila, Spain
1438²58.0ResignedAdministrator of Tuy, Spain
19 Jul 144161.5AppointedAdministrator of Segovia, Spain
19 Aug 144161.6ResignedAdministrator of Ávila, Spain
7 Mar 144666.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
7 Apr 144969.2AppointedAdministrator of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
25 Nov 145373.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Juan de Cervantes (VIAF: 2897513)
Juan Cardinal de Cervantes (born 1380, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLora del Río

  • a cardinal for 27.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1426
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast