Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Leonard Carrieri, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1914BornNaples, Italy
Jun 193016.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
25 Oct 193622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
196046.0AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
196652.0ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
20 Jun 200995.4DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary

MicroData Summary for Leonard Carrieri:
Father Leonard Carrieri SS.CC. (died ) Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary

  • a priest for 72.6 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015