Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Nicolás Valdés de Carriazo

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1549¹BornValladolid
26 Apr 161061.3AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
10 Oct 161162.7AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
9 Mar 161768.1DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Nicolás Valdés de Carriazo:
Bishop Juan Nicolás Valdés de Carriazo (died ) Bishop of Guadix

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 132, and Page 198
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 127, Number 810

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015