Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jaume Francesco Cardinal de Cardona i de Aragón

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1405¹BornUrgel
28 May 144540.4AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
22 Jul 144540.6InstalledBishop of Vic, Spain
15 Oct 145954.8AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
23 Sep 146156.7AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
18 Dec 146157.0Elevated to Cardinal
1 Dec 146661.9DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaume Francesco de Cardona i de Aragón:
Cardinal Jaume Francesco de Cardona i de Aragón (died ) Bishop of Urgell

  • a cardinal for 5.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1461

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013