Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Carrillo de Albornoz

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Nov 1486AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
27 Jun 1496AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
14 Jun 1514DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Carrillo de Albornoz
Bishop Alfonso Carrillo de Albornoz (died ) Bishop of Ávila

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast