Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand de Cardaillac

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Feb 1321AppointedBishop of Rieux, France
23 Oct 1321Ordained BishopBishop of Rieux, France
23 Jul 1324AppointedBishop of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de Cardaillac
Bishop Bertrand de Cardaillac , Bishop of Cahors

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,864
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 178, and Page 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 6 May 2019

Quantcast