Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Giuseppe Carcassona

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1684³Born
24 Feb 171429.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 173652.2AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
1 May 176075.8DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Giuseppe Carcassona
Bishop Antonio Giuseppe Carcassona (born , died ) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliari

  • a priest for 46.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 428
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,736, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast