Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guglielmo Cardinal Carbone

Deceased

Bishop of Chieti

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1396AppointedBishop of Chieti, Italy
6 Jun 1411Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jun 1411AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
22 Nov 1418DiedBishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Carbone:
Guglielmo Cardinal Carbone (died ) Bishop of Chieti

  • a cardinal for 7.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jun 1411

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015