Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Michele (Giuseppe) Carbone, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect of Eritrea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1836Born
1859²22.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 188852.1ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Sep 189457.9AppointedPrefect of Eritrea
24 Jun 191073.7DiedPrefect of Eritrea

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele (Giuseppe) Carbone (VIAF: 2846492)
Father Michele (Giuseppe) Carbone O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prefect of Eritrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarbonara Scrivia, Italy

  • a priest for 51.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: MW, 4 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast