Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Costanzio Cardinal Caracciolo

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1715BornNaples, Italy
24 Sep 175943.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175943.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
25 May 176044.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Dec 177055.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
22 Dec 178065.0DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Costanzio Caracciolo:
Cardinal Giovanni Costanzio Caracciolo (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

  • a cardinal for 21.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013