Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Bernardo Capreoli

Deceased

Bishop of Castro di Puglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642¹BornMassafra
13 Dec 168240.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Dec 168240.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 168341.0AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
Jul 1712³70.5DiedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Bernardo Capreoli:
Bishop Giovanni Bernardo Capreoli (born 1642, died Jul 1712) Bishop of Castro di Puglia

  • a priest for 29.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 148
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015