Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raimondo Cardinal Capizucchi, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1615Born
1 Sep 168165.8Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 168165.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
3 Mar 168771.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
22 Apr 169175.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli

MicroData Summary for Raimondo Capizucchi
Raimondo Cardinal Capizucchi O.P. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for 9.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018