Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Cani, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1670BornIglesias
5 Jun 169424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
17 Mar 172756.8AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
28 Nov 172757.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
Mar 1737³66.7DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Cani:
Bishop Nicola Cani O.P. (born ) Bishop of Bosa

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1733
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 124
  • ob: CB, 17 Jan 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,035

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015