Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Canard

Deceased

Bishop of Arras


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Sep 1392AppointedBishop of Arras, France
3 Nov 1392Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
7 Oct 1407DiedBishop of Arras, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Canard:
Bishop Jean Canard (died ) Bishop of Arras

  • a bishop for 14.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 116
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,587

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 5 Jan 2016