Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Campora, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caffa, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Mar 1427AppointedArchbishop of Cambaluc (Peking, Khanbaliq), China
23 Jan 1441AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Caffa, Italy
1459¹DiedBishop of Caffa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Campora
Archbishop Giacomo Campora O.P. (died 1459) Bishop of Caffa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 117
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 10 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 11 Jan 2020

Quantcast