Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ambrogio Campodonico

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1792Born
25 Jan 183542.4AppointedOfficial to Sardinia, Italy
1839¹46.3ResignedOfficial to Sardinia, Italy
30 Mar 184148.6AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
8 Nov 184553.2ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
22 Mar 186976.6DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Campodonico
Father Ambrogio Campodonico (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Brazil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelgandolfo, Suburbicarian See of Albano, Italy
Death PlaceCastelgandolfo, Suburbicarian See of Albano, Italy

Source(s):
  • b/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 76, and Page 252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast