Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Nicolas François Camanis, C.R.A. †

Deceased

Abbot of Saint-Maurice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1673³BornSt-Maurice
21 Apr 170431.0SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
2 Dec 170431.6ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
13 Nov 171542.6DiedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas François Camanis:
Abbot Nicolas François Camanis C.R.A. (born , died ) Abbot of Saint-Maurice

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books, 2015, 11, 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015