Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Marcelo Calvo, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lábrea, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1873BornBelorado, Spain
Jun 1926³52.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil
27 Jun 193056.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil
19 Nov 193360.1DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcelo Calvo:
Father Marcelo Calvo O.A.R. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lábrea

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/r/d: CB, 23 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014