Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvator Angelo Cadello

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1695BornCagliari
1 Apr 172428.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Apr 172428.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 174145.9SelectedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
3 Jul 174146.1ConfirmedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
6 Jan 176468.6DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvator Angelo Cadello:
Bishop Salvator Angelo Cadello (born , died ) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

  • a priest for 39.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1762
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013