Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Cáceres Casado

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1688BornSegovia
27 Jan 173849.1AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
15 Sep 174758.7DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Cáceres Casado:
Bishop Pedro Cáceres Casado (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 104
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 57, Number 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015