Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierfrancesco Cardinal Bussi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1683Born
24 Sep 175976.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175976.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
10 Sep 176582.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via

MicroData Summary for Pierfrancesco Bussi
Pierfrancesco Cardinal Bussi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for 5.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018