Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnold von Burgsdorff, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brandenburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jul 1472SelectedBishop of Brandenburg, Germany
5 Oct 1472ConfirmedBishop of Brandenburg, Germany
13 Feb 1473Ordained BishopBishop of Brandenburg, Germany
15 Jun 1485DiedBishop of Brandenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Arnold von Burgsdorff
Bishop Arnold von Burgsdorff O. Praem. (died ) Bishop of Brandenburg

  • a bishop for 12.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,616
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,473, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast