Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William de Burgh

Deceased

Bishop of Llandaff, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jul 1244AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
19 Feb 1245Ordained BishopBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
11 Jun 1253DiedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William de Burgh:
Bishop William de Burgh (died ) Bishop of Llandaff

  • a bishop for 8.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 59
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013