Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Burbano, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of PopayŠn, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Rhosus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1776³Born
1 Feb 179518.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
19 May 183760.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of PopayŠn, Colombia
19 May 183760.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
1 Aug 183761.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of PopayŠn, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Burbano
Bishop Antonio Burbano O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of PopayŠn

EventPlace
Birth PlacePasto

  • a priest for 42.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 323
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1837

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast