Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berthold von Buchegg, O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg


Events

DateEventTitle
7 May 1328AppointedBishop of Speyer, Germany
28 Nov 1328AppointedBishop of Strasbourg, France
25 Nov 1353DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Berthold von Buchegg:
Bishop Berthold von Buchegg O.T. (died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 460, and Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 18 Jan 2016