Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mathias de Bucheck

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Aug 1321AppointedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
3 Jul 1323Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
10 Sep 1328DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Mathias de Bucheck:
Archbishop Mathias de Bucheck (died ) Archbishop of Mainz

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 322
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014