Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Brulart de Genlis

Deceased

Archbishop of Embrun, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1633Born
18 Jun 166835.2SelectedArchbishop of Embrun, France
15 Jul 166936.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Embrun, France
Sep 1669²36.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Embrun, France
3 Nov 171481.6DiedArchbishop of Embrun, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Brulart de Genlis
Archbishop Charles Brulart de Genlis (born , died ) Archbishop of Embrun

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillequier-Aumont

  • a bishop for 45.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 190
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast