Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bertrand de Castronovo (de Chateauneuf)

Deceased

Bishop of Viviers (Aps)


Events

DateEventTitle
1348²AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
7 Jan 1349AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
8 Jan 1364AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
5 Sep 1365AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viviers (Aps), France
1374¹DiedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de Castronovo (de Chateauneuf):
Archbishop Bertrand de Castronovo (de Chateauneuf) , Bishop of Viviers (Aps)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 430, and Page 473
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 234, and Page 533

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 24 Jan 2014