Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Francis Brown, S.M.A.

Superior Emeritus of Kano, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1943 Born
16 Dec 197027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
22 Mar 199147.3AppointedSuperior of Kano, Nigeria
15 Dec 199552.0ResignedSuperior of Kano, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for John Francis Brown
Father John Francis Brown S.M.A. (born ) Superior Emeritus of Kano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrahule, Diocese of Derry, Ireland

Please contact the Father through the Mission "Sui Iuris" of Kano.

  • a priest for years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast